+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dobrinski
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 21, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor