+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 12
- General Order
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Fetgatter
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 18, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7