+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/09/2022
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
- Enacting clause stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary - Civil
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
- Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Walke
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Kannady
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor