+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Adoption of amendment rescinded
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
- Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 71 Nays: 10
- House Rule suspended
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16
- Referred for engrossment
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dunnington
- Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 60
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Brewer
- General Order
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dunnington
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 25, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor