+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed 05/19/2020
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
- Direct to Calendar
- Withdrawn from General Government committee
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8