+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 11, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8