+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 27; Ayes: 55 Nays: 27
- General Order
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Waldron
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
February 17, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7