+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
- SA's received
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Miller
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2