+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
- Coauthored by Representative Bashore
- Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter
- Coauthored by Representative Cornwell
- Coauthored by Representative Bush
- Coauthored by Representative Gann
- Coauthored by Representative May
- Coauthored by Representative Phillips
- Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David)
- Coauthored by Representative Smith
- Coauthored by Representative Grego
- Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
- Coauthored by Representative Sneed
- Coauthored by Representative Wallace
- Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
- Coauthored by Representative Davis
- Coauthored by Representative Walke
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Stearman
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Talley
- First Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley
- General Order
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
- Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
- Title stricken
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McDugle, Manger, Townley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
February 14, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor