+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Davis
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
- General Order
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
- CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Tourism
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dills
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 3