+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
- SA's read, adopted
- SA's considered
- Laid over
- Sent to Governor
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 25
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor