+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Utilities Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Utilities
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McBride
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor