+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Baker
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Hill
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn, Lawson
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roe
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
February 12, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6