+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Hilbert
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
February 17, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor