+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6
- Amended by floor substitute
- Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McEntire
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 2, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor