+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe (Dick)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Kerbs
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
February 8, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor