+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/06/2022
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- General Order, Amended
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Dollens
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- Amended by floor substitute
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Provenzano
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Bush
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11