+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remove as principal author Representative Moore and substitute with Representative Marti
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Moore
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 28, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor