+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 18
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ford
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11