+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McEntire
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
- Amended by floor substitute
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin, Munson, Bashore
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Lawson
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Tammy)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 26
February 14, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8