+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Perryman
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 25, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14