+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2018
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bennett (John)
- First Reading
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sanders
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
April 23, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 6
February 20, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 31
February 20, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 31
February 14, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor