+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Albright, Branham
- General Order
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Conley
- First Reading