+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Wright
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 10
February 7, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor