+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Died in conference
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Accountability
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Osborn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
February 27, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor