+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6
- SA's read, adopted
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
- Referred for engrossment
- Enacting clause restored
- Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 9
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens, Boles
- General Order
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Pae
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Rosecrants
- Remove as author Representative(s) Rosecrants
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Humphrey, Rosecrants
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 8
March 3, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1