+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Taylor
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 13, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12