+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
- Remove Representative Boles as principal House author and substitute with Representative Worthen
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Boles
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 27, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8