+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to States' Rights Committee
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Mulready
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 25, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor