+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
- General Order, Considered
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Mize
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor