+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McBride
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor