+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle
- First Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 18, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor