+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
February 16, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor