+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson
- General Order
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Lawson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
February 12, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor