+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie), Shelton
- First Reading
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 26
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer
- Referred for engrossment
- Amended
- Title stricken
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
- Remove Representative Hickman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Billy
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hickman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
February 25, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5