+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
- General Order, Considered
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Emergency removed
- Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Williams
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor