+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to County and Municipal Government
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1