+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed 04/30/2014
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety Committee
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Blackwell
- First Reading
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor