+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by McCullough
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 25
- Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hickman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6