+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 26
- Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush
- General Order
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dunnington
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 27, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor