+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Steagall
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor