+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Jackson
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
February 17, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor