+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 34
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Remove Representative Osburn as principal House author and substitute with Representative Taylor
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Osburn
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 6