+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
- Title restored
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David)
- CCR submitted
- To Senate
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
- General Order, Considered
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Referred to Appropriations
- Title stricken
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Amended by floor substitute
- House Rule suspended
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hilbert
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor