+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 14
- SA's read, adopted
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
- Remove as author Senator Leewright; authored by Senator Hall
- Referred to Appropriations
- Coauthored by Senator Leewright
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 15
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
- General Order
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hilbert
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
March 1, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 28