+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Pittman
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 8
- General Order
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Worthen
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
February 27, 2018: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor