+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
On May 20, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Kirt
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- To Senate
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Jech, Bullard, Coleman, Allen, Boren, Kirt
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
- Amended
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 5
- Referred for engrossment
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Elections and Ethics
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sims
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2022: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
April 27, 2022: Senate Advance
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9
April 27, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor