+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Senator Dahm
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Staires
- Amended
- Title stricken
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 10
- Referred for engrossment
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
- Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
On February 5, 2024 in the House:
- First Reading
- Authored by Representative Maynard
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 19, 2024: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2