+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Enacting clause stricken
- Coauthored by Ivester
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Murphey
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 25
- General Order
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Shannon
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor