+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- To Senate
- Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 6
- CCR adopted
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Simpson
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12
- General Order, Considered
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Justice
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Garrison
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
- Enacting clause stricken
- Coauthored by Marlatt
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Griffin
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Branan, Simpson
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Ballenger
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Walker
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17; Ayes: 43 Nays: 34
- General Order
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Rousselot, Echols, Smalley
- Referred for engrossment
- Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland, Lockhart, Brown, Watson, Sanders, Osborn
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Cockroft
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
February 17, 2014: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor